McArthur v. West Claims Recovery Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Jamie McArthur
Defendant: West Claims Recovery Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03337
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Referring Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/18/2020. (CLO)
February 17, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Settlement by Plaintiff Jamie McArthur. (Roberts, Christopher)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) (Unopposed) by Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. ORDERED: GRANTED. West Claims Recovery Services, LLC answer due 2/18/2020. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/3/2020. (CBL)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jamie L. Boyer by Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. (Boyer, Jamie) filed by West Claims Recovery Services, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Attorney Jamie L. Boyer terminated. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/3/20. (ARL)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) (Unopposed) by Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. (Gregg, Arthur)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jamie L. Boyer by Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. (Boyer, Jamie)
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Arthur David Gregg for Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. (Gregg, Arthur)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua C. Dickinson for Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. (Boyer, Jamie) filed by West Claims Recovery Services, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. West Claims Recovery Services, LLC answer due 2/3/2010. Signed by District Judge Sarah E Pitlyk on 1/2/20. (ARL)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC to State Court Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boyer, Jamie)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. (Boyer, Jamie)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by David T. Butsch for Plaintiff Jamie McArthur. (Butsch, David)
December 26, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JWD)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Jefferson County Circuit Court, filed by Jamie McArthur.(JWD)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant West Claims Recovery Services, LLC to Plaintiff Sent To: Plaintiff (Boyer, Jamie)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to United States District Court from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Missouri, case number 19JE-CC00825, with receipt number AMOEDC-7657745, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by West Claims Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Boyer, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McArthur v. West Claims Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie McArthur
Represented By: Christopher E. Roberts
Represented By: David T. Butsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Claims Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Jamie L. Boyer
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?