Pennington et al v. Visbal
Petitioner: Edward D. Jones & Co., L. P. and Penny Pennington
Respondent: Kristen Visbal
Case Number: 4:2019mc00873
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous Case
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. All matters having been resolved, the Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/20/2019. (AFC)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Edward D. Jones & Co., L. P., Penny Pennington. (Rehmann, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Edward D. Jones & Co., L. P., Penny Pennington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rehmann, John)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Following a telephone conference held with counsel on November 15, 2019, and for the reasons discussed during the telephone conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than November 18, 2019, the parties shall file a status report advising the Court as to whether the parties have reached any agreement regarding the motion to quash (ECF No. 1) and what, if any, issues remain for ruling. (Status Report due by 11/18/2019.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/15/19. (EAB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Quash with receipt number AMOEDC-7573944, in the amount of $47 filed by Movants Edward D. Jones & Co., L. P., Penny Pennington. (Rehmann, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash with receipt number AMOEDC-7573944, in the amount of $47 filed by Respondent Kristen Visbal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25)(Guymon, Kayden)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Hearing re #1 MOTION to Quash with receipt number AMOEDC-7573944, in the amount of $47 filed by Respondent Kristen Visbal. (Guymon, Kayden)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent Kristen Visbal shall file a response to the pending motions (ECF Nos. 1 & 2) no later than November 14, 2019. After reviewing the response, the Court will determine whether to hold a hearing in this matter. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on November 12, 2019. (MCB)
November 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip Allen Cantwell for Movants Edward D. Jones & Co., L. P., Penny Pennington. (Cantwell, Philip) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/12/2019 to correct PDF error) (JWD). Modified on 11/12/2019 (JWD).
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Hearing re #1 MOTION to Quash with receipt number AMOEDC-7573944, in the amount of $47 by Movants Edward D. Jones & Co., L. P., Penny Pennington. (Rehmann, John)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash with receipt number AMOEDC-7573944, in the amount of $47, filed by Penny Pennington, Edward D. Jones & Co., L. P.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Kavaler Declaraton + Exhibits, #2 Attachment B - Rehmann Declaration + Exhibits)(Rehmann, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington et al v. Visbal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kristen Visbal
Represented By: Megan Rapp
Represented By: Steven Mitby
Represented By: Robert Caleb Colbert
Represented By: Kayden Kent Guymon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward D. Jones & Co., L. P.
Represented By: John Rehmann, II
Represented By: Philip Allen Cantwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Penny Pennington
Represented By: John Rehmann, II
Represented By: Philip Allen Cantwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?