Steinbrook v. Speede Delivery Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Derek Steinbrook
Defendant: Speede Delivery Service, Inc. and Nathan Roesch
Case Number: 4:2020cv00015
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM Request for Summons by Plaintiff Derek Steinbrook. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Burke, Candice)
March 3, 2020 ***REMARK re doc #10 : Advised counsel to file the summons for issuance. Upon filing, the Court will issue and email to counsel. (KJS)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM Request for Summons by Plaintiff Derek Steinbrook. (Burke, Candice)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Bradley W. Cundiff. Review of case shows that Attorney Bradley W. Cundiff is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (KJS)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Candice Rose Burke for Plaintiff Derek Steinbrook. (Burke, Candice)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Bradley W. Cundiff. Review of case shows that Attorney Bradley W. Cundiff is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (KJS)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Nathan Roesch.(Zeidler, Edward)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John P. Rahoy for Defendant Nathan Roesch. (Rahoy, John)
January 7, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Derek Steinbrook.(BAK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Bradley W. Cundiff. Review of case shows that Attorney Bradley W. Cundiff is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (BAK) Copy of notification sent to attorney Cundiff on 1/7/2020 (BAK).
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nathan Roesch Sent To: Plaintiff (Zeidler, Edward)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC11614, with receipt number AMOEDC-7672107, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Nathan Roesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Zeidler, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinbrook v. Speede Delivery Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Steinbrook
Represented By: Candice Rose Burke
Represented By: Bradley W. Cundiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speede Delivery Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Roesch
Represented By: Edward W. Zeidler, II
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?