Hudson v. Kennedy et al
Plaintiff: RENN HUDSON
Defendant: Gully Transportation, Inc. and SHELBY KENNEDY
Case Number: 4:2020cv00016
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Plaintiff Renn Hudson. (O'Leary, James)
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Defendant Shelby Kennedy. (Waller, J.)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference set for February 14, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELED. The Court will enter the Case Management Order, if necessary, after disposition of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/6/2020. (ALM)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Shelby Kennedy. . (Waller, J.)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Renn Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(O'Leary, James)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/7/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/14/2020 10:30 AM in Chambers - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/14/2020. (KCB) Modified on 1/15/2020 (TMT).
January 7, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Shelby Kennedy. (BAK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Shelby Kennedy.(BAK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Renn Hudson.(BAK)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Suess for Defendant Shelby Kennedy. (Suess, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Shelby Kennedy. (Waller, J.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Shelby Kennedy Sent To: State Court - Unexecuted (Waller, J.) Modified on 1/7/2020 (BAK).
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Shelby Kennedy Sent To: Plaintiff (Waller, J.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Michael Waller for Defendant Shelby Kennedy. (Waller, J.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC11533, with receipt number AMOEDC-7672157, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Shelby Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Group Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Group Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form)(Waller, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gully Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELBY KENNEDY
Represented By: J. Michael Waller
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Suess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENN HUDSON
Represented By: James D. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?