Power Investments, LLC v. SL EC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Power Investments, LLC
Defendant: SL EC LLC and Michael F. Becker
Case Number: 4:2020cv00028
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 38. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Tue Jan 14 15:12:24 CST 2020 (Stamm, Katie)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Lift Stay (Doc. 92 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Consolidate (Doc. 96 ), is GRANTED. The parties are directed to file documents in the above-captioned case. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a new joint proposed scheduling plan within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/14/20. (KKS)
January 13, 2020 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Elkin L. Kistner for Defendants Michael F. Becker, SL EC LLC. (Kistner, Elkin)
January 13, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiff Power Investments, LLC with case number 4:18-cv-1377 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Walsh, Jared)
January 10, 2020 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Jared M. Walsh for Plaintiff Power Investments, LLC. (Walsh, Jared)
January 10, 2020 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher LaRose for Plaintiff Power Investments, LLC. (LaRose, Christopher)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 33. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Thu Jan 9 15:25:54 CST 2020 (Stamm, Katie)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference with counsel is set for Tuesday, January 14, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. in the chambers of the undersigned.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/9/20. (KKS)
January 8, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (MRC)
January 8, 2020 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00466. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: 1. Parties' #29 JOINT MOTION to Change Venue is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the Eastern District of Missouri, Eastern Division. 3. All further filings in this case shall be filed with that Court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/7/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
January 6, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #29 JOINT MOTION to Change Venue by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (JJ)
January 6, 2020 Filing 29 JOINT MOTION to Change Venue by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order -Agreed Order of Transfer)(Mooney, William)
December 30, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #28 Joint Status Report (JJ)
December 27, 2019 Filing 28 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Memorandum and Order)(Mooney, William)
December 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #27 Status Report (JJ)
December 2, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Missouri Docket Sheet)(Mooney, William)
November 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #26 Joint Status Report (JJ)
November 4, 2019 Filing 26 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Missouri Docket Sheet)(Mooney, William)
October 9, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #25 Status Report (JJ)
October 8, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Missouri Docket Sheet)(Mooney, William)
September 12, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #24 Status Report (JJ)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO William Mooney re #24 Status Report; Error: attachment was insufficiently described as "Exhibit A." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (JJ)
September 9, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mooney, William)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. The parties' #22 JOINT MOTION to Stay is GRANTED; 2. This case is STAYED for a period not to exceed 6 months form the date of this Order; 3. The parties are directed to file monthly status report on the first Monday of every month (beginning September 2019) & to notify the Court promptly when the Court for the EDMI issues a ruling concerning the pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/18/2019.(KM)cc: COR
July 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: re #22 JOINT MOTION to Stay (STC)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO William Mooney re #22 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Michael F. Becker ; Error: the pleading was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (STC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Michael F. Becker, Power Investments, LLC, SL EC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eastern District of Missouri Civil Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Case Management Order, #3 Proposed Order Temporarily Stay)(Mooney, William) Modified filers on 7/18/2019 (STC).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that defendants are to file an answer or another responsive pleading within 21 days. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/12/2019.(GLD)cc: COR
July 12, 2019 ***Reopen Document #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (GLD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 MANDATE of USCA as to #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Power Investments, LLC Appeal Reversed district court decision and remanded (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(GLD)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 INFORMATION COPY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT of USCA as to #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Power Investments, LLC Judgment of district court is reversed. Mandate to Issue. (Attachments: #1 Judgment, #2 Cover Letter)(GLD)
February 7, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #18 Notice (GLD)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Power Investments, LLC Notice of Withdrawal (Smith, Andrew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 USCA Case Number 18-6098 Case Manager Cheryl Borkowski for #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Power Investments, LLC. (GLD)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #15 Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions by Power Investments, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0643-4191653. (Smith, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendants SL EC, LLCs, and Michael Beckers #7 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. 2. Defendants' motion to transfer #14 is DENIED as moot.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/14/2018.(GLD)cc: COR
September 7, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO William Mooney re #14 MOTION for Order by Michael F. Becker MOTION TO TRANSFER: Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A, Exhibit B. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (GLD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION To Transfer by Michael F. Becker (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MOTION TO TRANSFER, #2 Exhibit A - Fayette Circuit Court Records, #3 Exhibit B - USDC, Eastern Division of Missouri Court Records, #4 Proposed Order)(Mooney, William) Modified on 9/7/2018 (GLD).
September 5, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO William Mooney re #13 REPLY: Error: a link was not created to the related document. Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create the link; In the future, create a link to the related document. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (GLD)
September 5, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (GLD)
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of their Motion to Dismiss #7 filed by Michael F. Becker. (Mooney, William) Modified to correct link on 9/5/2018 (GLD).
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties' #11 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time, docketed as a motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/4/2018. (KM)cc: COR, Attorneys Maschmeyer, Brown via U.S. mail. Modified on 9/4/2018 (KM).
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation For Extension of Time by Michael F. Becker. (Mooney, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Power Investments, LLC. (Smith, Andrew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Andrew Smith. #8 Response in Opposition to Motion has been filed by Power Investments, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (GLD)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC filed by Power Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Mason L. Miller 8/21/18, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Andrew)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-MLM Legal Articles of Org, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Missouri Compl, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Becker Summons & Sec of State Filing, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E - SL EC Sec of State Return, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F - Leara Aff, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G - SLEC Summons and Green Card Signed by Mooney, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H - Motion to Set Aside, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT I - Subpoenas to Banks, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT J - Response to Motion to Quash, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT K - Suburban Heights Prom Note and Bank Account Statement, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT L - Order Setting Aside Default Judgment, #14 Exhibit EXHIBIT M - 2nd Missouri Action, #15 Exhibit EXHIBIT N - Mason Miller Affidavit, #16 Exhibit EXHIBIT O - Mike Becker Affidavit, #17 Proposed Order 2018-07-31 Defendants Proposed Order for MTD)(Mooney, William) Modified on 7/12/2019 (GLD).
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTPURSUANT TO FED. R.CIV. P.71 by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Mooney, William)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Dylan Maschmeyer by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (STC)
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Robert L. Brown by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (STC)
July 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William Mooney. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by SL EC, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (STC)
July 25, 2018 Conflict Check run. (STC)
July 24, 2018 Filing 32 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Fayette Circuit Court, filed by Power Investments, LLC.(MRC)
July 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 17-CI-03850. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4127603), filed by SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Investments, LLC v. SL EC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Investments, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Robinson Smith
Represented By: Carl D. Edwards, Jr.
Represented By: Jared M. Walsh
Represented By: Christopher LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SL EC LLC
Represented By: William H. Mooney
Represented By: Robert L. Brown
Represented By: Dylan R. Maschmeyer
Represented By: Elkin L. Kistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Becker
Represented By: William H. Mooney
Represented By: Robert L. Brown
Represented By: Dylan R. Maschmeyer
Represented By: Elkin L. Kistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?