Glaze v. Proffer Wholesale Produce, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jared Glaze
Defendant: Proffer Wholesale Produce, Inc. and Lacey Walker
Case Number: 4:2020cv00045
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Proffer Wholesale Produce, Inc., Lacey Walker.(O'Toole, Daniel)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jared Glaze Proffer Wholesale Produce, Inc. waiver signed on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Lacey Walker waiver signed on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Reinberg, Stephen)
January 13, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued: 1 All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JWD)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Proffer Wholesale Produce, Inc., Lacey Walker with receipt number AMOEDC-7683562, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jared Glaze. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reinberg, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2020: #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service) (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaze v. Proffer Wholesale Produce, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proffer Wholesale Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel K. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Walker
Represented By: Daniel K. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Glaze
Represented By: Stephen Cody Reinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?