Strait Realty, LLC v. Your First Choice Realty, LLC
Plaintiff: Strait Realty, LLC
Defendant: Your First Choice Realty, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00103
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Your First Choice Realty, LLC. The summons was emailed to G. Harley Blosser. (ARL)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Alias Summons: by Plaintiff Strait Realty, LLC (Blosser, G.)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Jean C. Hamilton no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. (KJS)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Due to conflict of interest, this Court hereby recuses itself from this case. This case will be reassigned to another Judge.(Reassignment order to follow) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/23/20. (KJS)
January 23, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to G. Harley Blosser. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (MFG)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Strait Realty, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Blosser, G.)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Strait Realty, LLC Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Blosser, G.)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Your First Choice Realty, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7705359, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Strait Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- TM Registration, #2 Exhibit B- Internet Searches/ads, #3 Exhibit C- Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #5 Original Filing Form filing form, #6 Summons summons)(Blosser, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strait Realty, LLC v. Your First Choice Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strait Realty, LLC
Represented By: G. Harley Blosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Your First Choice Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?