Bumb et al v. United Credit and Collections, Inc.
Plaintiff: Austin Bumb and Joseph DeLiso
Defendant: United Credit and Collections, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00106
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Parties to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/23/2020. (EAB)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by United Credit and Collections, Inc..(Klein, Mayer)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL re #7 Summons Returned Executed Corrected Process Server's Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff Austin Bumb. (Graypel, Boris)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant United Credit and Collections, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response to Court due by 3/16/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 2/25/20. (EAB)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant United Credit and Collections, Inc.. (Klein, Mayer)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Austin Bumb. United Credit and Collections, Inc. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Graypel, Boris) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/18/2020) (MCB).
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob M. Glickfield for Defendant United Credit and Collections, Inc.. (Glickfield, Jacob)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Mayer S. Klein for Defendant United Credit and Collections, Inc.. (Klein, Mayer)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Austin Bumb, Joseph DeLiso Process Server: William Stage (BAK)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Boris E. Graypel for Plaintiffs Austin Bumb, Joseph DeLiso. (BAK)
January 23, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Boris E. Graypel. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant United Credit and Collections, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7706188, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Austin Bumb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Appearance of Counsel, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Summons Form, #5 Process Server Request Form)(Graypel, Boris) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2020: #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3) (BAK). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/23/2020) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumb et al v. United Credit and Collections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Credit and Collections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Bumb
Represented By: Boris E. Graypel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph DeLiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?