Kapp v. Steingrandt et al
Plaintiff: Jane Kapp
Defendant: James Steingrandt, JDS Cattle Company and JDS Cattle Company, LTD
Case Number: 4:2020cv00221
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant JDS Cattle Company, LTD, James Steingrandt Amendment to #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Jane Kapp. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint filed by Jane Kapp.(CLO)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Jane Kapp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Simon, John) filed by Jane Kapp ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/2/2020. (CLO)
April 1, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Jane Kapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Simon, John)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2; Motion to Join Parties due by 7/1/2020. Discovery Completion due by 12/11/2020. ADR Future Reference 9/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/19/20. (KKS)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: There being no objection, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for Tuesday, March 24, 2020, is CANCELLED. A Case Management Order will be entered by separate order of the Court.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/19/20. (KKS)
March 16, 2020 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenneth Powell, III for Plaintiff Jane Kapp. (Powell, Kenneth)
March 16, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Jane Kapp. . (Simon, John)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm The Eason Law Firm and James W. Eason by Plaintiff Jane Kapp. Attorney James W. Eason terminated.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/12/20. (KKS)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm The Eason Law Firm and James W. Eason by Plaintiff Jane Kapp. (Eason, James)
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by John G. Simon for Plaintiff Jane Kapp. (Simon, John)
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by John M. Simon for Plaintiff Jane Kapp. (Simon, John)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2; Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/17/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/24/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/19/20. (KKS)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 JDS Cattle Company, Ltd's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by JDS Cattle Company, LTD.(Hamilton, Kathleen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 James Steingrandt's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by James Steingrandt.(Hamilton, Kathleen)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for a more definitive statement (Doc. No. #8 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/14/2020. (CLO)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants , filed by Jane Kapp.(Eason, James)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant JDS Cattle Company, LTD. (Hamilton, Kathleen)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant JDS Cattle Company, LTD. (Hamilton, Kathleen)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by James Steingrandt.(Hamilton, Kathleen)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph Holland Neill for Defendant James Steingrandt. (Neill, Joseph)
February 7, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Jane Kapp.(MFG)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathleen S. Hamilton for Defendant James Steingrandt. (Hamilton, Kathleen)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant James Steingrandt. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Hamilton, Kathleen)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant James Steingrandt Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1)(Hamilton, Kathleen)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saint Louis County, case number 19SL-CC05791, with receipt number AMOEDC-7738343, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by James Steingrandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Hamilton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kapp v. Steingrandt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Steingrandt
Represented By: Kathleen S. Hamilton
Represented By: Joseph Holland Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDS Cattle Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDS Cattle Company, LTD
Represented By: Kathleen S. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Kapp
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kenneth Powell, III
Represented By: James W. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?