Nekouee v. Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: Caplaco Fourteen, Inc., Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc. and Panera, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00258
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Panera, LLC. (Liss, Jessica) filed by Panera, LLC ; GRANTED Panera, LLC (answer due 4/30/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/1/20. (JMP)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Panera, LLC. (Liss, Jessica)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER Re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Panera, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Panera, LLC answer due 3/31/2020. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/13/2020. (AFC)
March 12, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Morgan Knott for Defendant Panera, LLC. (Knott, Morgan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Panera, LLC. (Liss, Jessica)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica L. Liss for Defendant Panera, LLC. (Liss, Jessica)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Caplaco Fourteen, Inc..(Clark, Kevin)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc..(Clark, Kevin)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc... (Clark, Kevin)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Caplaco Fourteen, Inc... (Clark, Kevin)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin P. Clark for Defendant Caplaco Fourteen, Inc.. (Clark, Kevin)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin P. Clark for Defendant Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc.. (Clark, Kevin)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fred Nekouee. Panera, LLC served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Vincze, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fred Nekouee. Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc. served on 2/16/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Vincze, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fred Nekouee. Caplaco Fourteen, Inc. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Vincze, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Robert J. Vincze. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee Process Server: Eastern Missouri Legal Services (Vincze, Robert)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7753575, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc., #4 Summons Caplaco Fourteen, Inc., #5 Summons Panera, LLC)(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caplaco Fourteen, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dierbergs Zumbehl, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panera, LLC
Represented By: Morgan Knott
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert Joseph Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?