Mendoza et al v. BSB Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nataly Mendoza and David Flores Rios
Defendant: Jujhar Singh, BSB Transport, Inc., Reliable Transportation Soluntions, LLC and Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00270
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Referring Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 73 Plaintiff's Reply to Affirmative defenses of Reliable Transportation Solutions by Nataly Mendoza.(Flaherty, Patrick) Modified on 4/16/2020 (TMT).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Singh and BSB Transport are granted an extension of time, up to and including April 21, 2020, to file their answers to plaintiffs amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/07/2020. (KCB)
April 6, 2020 Filing 71 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings. (KCB)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall randomly reassign this case to a United States District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on April 6, 2020. (BRP)
March 27, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC, Jujhar Singh to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BRP)
March 20, 2020 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Nataly Mendoza. Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC served on 1/4/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Flaherty, Patrick) Modified on 3/23/2020 (CBL).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #66 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before March 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 3/19/2020. (KBL)
March 18, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint by Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC.(Weisenbach, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weisenbach, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #62 Order to Show Cause,,, Add and Terminate Parties,, by Plaintiff Nataly Mendoza. (Flaherty, Patrick)
March 9, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC, Jujhar Singh, Plaintiff Nataly Mendoza to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BRP)
March 6, 2020 Filing 64 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Stephen Weisenbach for Defendant Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Weisenbach, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 63 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel E. Tranen for Defendant Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Tranen, Daniel)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order why this action as to Defendant Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of timely service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of the First Amended Complaint, the Clerk of Court shall update the docket and terminate Mr. Rios from this action as of November 22, 2019. ( Show Cause Response due by 3/16/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on March 2, 2020. (BRP)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. #60 ) filed by Attorneys Perry William Hoag and James Leighton O'Connell-Miller is GRANTED. Attorneys Perry William Hoag and James Leighton O'Connell-Miller are terminated from this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 2/27/2020. (KBL)
February 27, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Perry Hoag and James L. O'Connell-Miller/Cameli & Hoag, P.C. by Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar Singh. (Brooker, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 59 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew J. Brooker for Defendant Jujhar Singh. (Brooker, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 58 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D. Matteuzzi for Defendant Jujhar Singh. (Matteuzzi, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Filing 57 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick M. Flaherty for Plaintiff Nataly Mendoza. (Flaherty, Patrick)
February 21, 2020 Filing 56 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew J. Brooker for Defendants BSB Transport, Inc. (Brooker, Matthew) Modified on 2/24/2020 (BRP).
February 21, 2020 Filing 55 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D. Matteuzzi for Defendants BSB Transport, Inc. (Matteuzzi, Michael) Modified on 2/24/2020 (BRP).
February 18, 2020 Filing 54 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
February 18, 2020 Filing 53 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03952. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
February 18, 2020 Filing 52 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Missouri the electronic file via email. (las, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/31/2020. Mailed notice(las, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for a court order #46 is granted. Joint motion #49 is moot. Motion hearing held on 1/31/2020. Enter Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION by Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar SinghJoint Motion Joint Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoag, Perry)
January 28, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE by Nataly Mendoza to MOTION by Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar Singh For Court Order #46 (Flaherty, Patrick)
January 23, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Motion by Perry William Hoag for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #46 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/31/2020 at 10:30 AM. (Hoag, Perry)
January 23, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION by Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar Singh For Court Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hoag, Perry)
January 3, 2020 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion hearing held on 1/3/2020. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss #43 is due on or before 1/10/2020. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 2, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Reliable Transportation Soluntions, LLC. (txl, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #43 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/3/2020 at 10:30 AM. (O'Connell-Miller, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION by Defendants Jujhar Singh, BSB Transport, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and improper venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jujhar Singh, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ravinder Brar)(O'Connell-Miller, James)
December 26, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Unopposed motion for second extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to first amended complaint #39 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 27, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 41 Corrected NOTICE of Motion by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #39 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/27/2019 at 10:30 AM. (O'Connell-Miller, James)
December 20, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #39 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/27/2019 at 10:30 AM. (O'Connell-Miller, James)(Incorrect document linked) Modified on 12/23/2019 (las, ).
December 20, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION by Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar Singh for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #35 or otherwise respond to First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain Last Dated Dec. 20, 2019)(O'Connell-Miller, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond #36 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 13, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #36 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/13/2019 at 10:30 AM. (O'Connell-Miller, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION by Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar Singh for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #35 or otherwise respond to complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain Dated December 6, 2019)(O'Connell-Miller, James)
November 25, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Reliable Transportation Soluntions, LLC (ec, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 35 First AMENDED complaint by Nataly Mendoza against Nataly Mendoza (Flaherty, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Amended motion for leave to file amended complaint #32 is granted. Motion to appoint Special Administrator #29 is granted. Motion hearing held on 11/22/2019. The status hearing set for 12/13/2019 is stricken. Status hearing is reset for 2/7/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick M. Flaherty for presentment of motion for leave to file #32 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/22/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Flaherty, Patrick)
November 19, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Nataly Mendoza for leave to file first amended complaint (Flaherty, Patrick)
November 8, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for leave to appoint a special commissioner and motion for leave to file an amended complaint are #28 denied with leave to file an amended complaint on or before 12/13/20. Motion hearing held on 11/8/2019. Status hearing is set for 12/13/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick M. Flaherty for presentment of motion for leave to file #28 , motion for hearing #29 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Flaherty, Patrick)
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Nataly Mendoza for hearing petition to appoint special administrator (Flaherty, Patrick)
November 1, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Nataly Mendoza for leave to file amended complaint (Flaherty, Patrick)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Plaintiffs have failed to properly plead subject matter jurisdiction in their Complaint. The Court will allow Plaintiff an opportunity to amend and cure the pleading by no later than November 15, 2019; otherwise, this case may be dismissed. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file first amended complaint #21 and motion to appoint special administrator #20 are therefore denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 10/30/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: The notice of motion hearings set for November 1, 2019 are stricken. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, November 1, 2019. The court will issue an order. Mailed notice (ewf, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar Singh by Perry William Hoag (Hoag, Perry)
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BSB Transport, Inc. (O'Connell-Miller, James)
October 29, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar Singh by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller (O'Connell-Miller, James)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick M. Flaherty for presentment of motion for leave to file #21 , motion for hearing #20 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/1/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Flaherty, Patrick)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Nataly Mendoza for leave to file first amended complaint (Flaherty, Patrick)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Nataly Mendoza for hearing to appoint special administrator (Flaherty, Patrick)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 appearance by Nataly Mendoza for Ignacio Mendoza by Christopher Warmbold (Flaherty, Patrick)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 appearance by Nataly Mendoza for Maria Mendoza by Christopher Warmbold (Flaherty, Patrick)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 appearance by Nataly Mendoza for Ignacio Mendoza (Flaherty, Patrick)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 Appearance for Mendoza by Nataly Mendoza (Flaherty, Patrick)
August 7, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Jujhar Singh. (mc, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Nataly Mendoza, David Flores Rios by Patrick M. Flaherty Christopher Warmbold (Flaherty, Patrick)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Nataly Mendoza, David Flores Rios by Patrick M. Flaherty (Flaherty, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 7/1/2019. Mailed notice(las, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to withdraw as attorney #10 is granted. Whiting Law Group is granted leave to withdraw. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, June 28, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Michael Whiting for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #10 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/28/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Whiting, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Attorney Timothy M. Whiting to withdraw as attorney for Nataly Mendoza, David Flores Rios. New address information: NATALY MENDOZA, 531 Broadway Apt. 1 Aurora, IL 60605 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notification of Party Contact Information)(Whiting, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Attorney Timothy M. Whiting to withdraw as attorney for Nataly Mendoza, David Flores Rios. New address information: NATALY MENDOZA, 531 Broadway Apt. 1 Aurora, IL 60605 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notification of Party Contact Information)(Whiting, Timothy) (Incorrect pdf document linked - Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 6/14/2019. Mailed notice (aee, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for inspection and a protective order #2 , #5 is granted. Motion hearing held on 6/14/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BSB Transport, Inc., Jujhar Singh (lma, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Michael Whiting for presentment of motion for protective order #5 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/14/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Whiting, Timothy)
June 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Nataly Mendoza, David Flores Rios for protective order Amended Motion (Whiting, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Whiting, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Emergency Motion NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Michael Whiting for presentment of motion for protective order #2 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/14/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Whiting, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiffs Nataly Mendoza, David Flores Rios for protective order Emergency Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Whiting, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Flores Rios, Nataly Mendoza; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15923858.(Whiting, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza et al v. BSB Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jujhar Singh
Represented By: James Leighton O'Connell-Miller
Represented By: Perry William Hoag
Represented By: Matthew J. Brooker
Represented By: Michael D. Matteuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSB Transport, Inc.
Represented By: James Leighton O'Connell-Miller
Represented By: Perry William Hoag
Represented By: Matthew J. Brooker
Represented By: Michael D. Matteuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Transportation Soluntions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Transportation Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Represented By: Michael Stephen Weisenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nataly Mendoza
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whiting
Represented By: Patrick M. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Flores Rios
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whiting
Represented By: Patrick M. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?