Doe v. Greater St. Louis Area Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Samuel Carleton, Boy Scouts of America, Greater St. Louis Area Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. and Samuel Christian Carleton
Case Number: 4:2020cv00273
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE Entry of Consent Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 105(a) and 362 Granting the BSA's Motion for Preliminary Injunction: by Defendant Boy Scouts of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Assouad, Justin)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE Plaintiff's Statement Pursuant to Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027(e)(3) and Demand for Jury Trial: by Plaintiff John Doe re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court and Memorandum in Support to St. Francois County (Knepper, Nicole)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court and Memorandum in Support to St. Francois County by Plaintiff John Doe. (Knepper, Nicole)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Defendant Boy Scouts of America Notice of Commencement of Adversary Proceeding and Filing of MOtion for Preliminary Injunction by the BSA, Meeting to Consider the Formation of an Official Committee of Creditors and Filing of Motion by the BSA Debtors to Fix Venue for Claims Related to teh Bankruptcy Under 28 U.S.C. Section 157(b)(5) and 1334(b) (Assouad, Justin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Boy Scouts of America, Samuel Christian Carleton, Greater St. Louis Area Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc., Plaintiff John Doe. (KEK)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Greater St. Louis Area Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Assouad, Justin)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Boy Scouts of America Sent To: State Court - Executed (Assouad, Justin)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 19, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Samuel Christian Carleton.(MFG)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER of Defendant Boy Scouts of America by Boy Scouts of America.(MFG)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 Answer of Defendant Greater St. Louis Area Council by Greater St. Louis Area Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc..(MFG)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: State Court of St. Francois County, filed by John Doe.(MFG)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Boy Scouts of America Sent To: Plaintiff (Assouad, Justin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Boy Scouts of America. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Assouad, Justin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin L. Assouad for Defendant Boy Scouts of America. (Assouad, Justin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Francois County, case number 19SF-CC00053, with receipt number AMOEDC-7758530, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment State File)(Assouad, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Greater St. Louis Area Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Carleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Justin L. Assouad
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater St. Louis Area Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Justin L. Assouad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Christian Carleton
Represented By: J. Martin Hadican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Matthew J. Padberg
Represented By: Nicole Burlison Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?