Gaines v. Waggoner
Plaintiff: Doris Gaines
Defendant: Wilson Waggoner
Case Number: 4:2020cv00324
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Doris Gaines. . (Merlin, Robert)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Letter sent to party not electronically notified this date. Tue Mar 31 11:21:50 CDT 2020 (Long, Carol)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 Letter to attorney Sarah H. Hale from Clerk Re:Admission To Practice Law (MFG)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Mon Mar 30 15:34:06 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Mon Mar 30 15:30:16 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/21/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/28/2020 02:30 PM in Telephone Conference before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/30/2020. (KEK)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Wilson Waggoner.(Sanner, Jon)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Defendant Wilson Waggoner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Answer to Plaintiff's Petition, # 2 Exhibit B - Service on Defendant, # 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Jon R. Sanner)(Sanner, Jon) filed by Wilson Waggoner ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/25/20. (ARL)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Defendant Wilson Waggoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer to Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Service on Defendant, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Jon R. Sanner)(Sanner, Jon)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael S. Butterfield for Defendant Wilson Waggoner. (Butterfield, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Thu Mar 19 15:21:37 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a motion for default no later than March 31, 2020. Failure to file a motion for default by March 31, 2020 may result in this action being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/19/2020. (KEK)
February 28, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant Wilson Waggoner. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sanner, Jon)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Doris Gaines.(MFG)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wilson Waggoner Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Sanner, Jon)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon R. Sanner for Defendant Wilson Waggoner. (Sanner, Jon)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC08020, with receipt number AMOEDC-7779536, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Wilson Austin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Memorandum to Court/Summons, #3 Exhibit settlement demand, #4 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #5 Original Filing Form original filing form, #6 Attachment State Court File)(Sanner, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Waggoner
Represented By: Jon R. Sanner
Represented By: Michael S. Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Gaines
Represented By: Robert S. Merlin
Represented By: Sarah H. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?