Stalnaker v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Velma Stalnaker
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Inc. and PTI Royston, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00356
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motions for Joinder in Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendants PTI Royston, LLC, PTI Union, LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, and Cyprus Mines Corporation [ #24 , #29 , #32 , #33 ] are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Johnson & Johnson Defendants Motion to Stay All Proceedings [ #7 ] is GRANTED. This case shall be STAYED pending a decision by the MDL Panel on whether to transfer this case to MDL No. 2738 in the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that all other pending motions are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/10/20. (JAB)
April 10, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Remand by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for Joinder Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendants PTI Royston, LLC, PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
April 10, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendants PTI Royston, LLC, PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
April 10, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
April 10, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
April 9, 2020 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Rankin, W.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Hearing re #43 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #43 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Rankin, W.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Seal Document - Memo in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cyprus Mines Corporation) filed by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
April 8, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cyprus Amax Minerals Company) filed by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven)
March 26, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cyprus Mines Corporation) by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cyprus Amax Minerals Company) by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Hearing re #43 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT re #45 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Exhibit H Filed Under Seal by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT re #45 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Exhibit F Filed Under Seal by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT re #45 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Exhibit D Filed Under Seal by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT re #45 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Exhibit C Filed Under Seal by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT re #45 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Exhibit B Filed Under Seal by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 46 SEALED DOCUMENT re #45 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Exhibit A Filed Under Seal by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #43 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Remand by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 24, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Joinder re #38 REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven) Modified on 3/25/2020; corrected document link (JAB).
March 24, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Joinder re #38 REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven) Modified on 3/25/2020; corrected document link (JAB).
March 23, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 23, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 23, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rankin, W.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Velma Stalnaker. (Blair, William)
March 12, 2020 Filing 36 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings (KEK)
March 12, 2020 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. Parent companies: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Walsh, Steven)
March 12, 2020 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. Parent companies: Freeport Minerals Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Walsh, Steven)
March 12, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
March 12, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven)
March 12, 2020 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Walsh, Steven)
March 12, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT re #21 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit F to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal : Exhibit F by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Walsh, Steven)
March 12, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit F to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F - to be submitted under seal, #8 Exhibit G)(Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Thomas Walsh for Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
March 12, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A. Prost for Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Prost, Mark)
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Anne Mellow for Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
March 6, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 Consent to Removal by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (MFG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 Consent to Removal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (MFG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 Consent to Removal by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (MFG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 Consent to Removal by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (MFG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Velma Stalnaker.(MFG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rea Order, #2 Exhibit Phillips Order, #3 Exhibit Kannady Order, #4 Exhibit Bathon Order)(Rankin, W.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Rankin, W.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Rankin, W.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc... (Rankin, W.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Rankin, W.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Beth A. Bauer for Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 2022-CC00190, with receipt number AMOEDC-7794805, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Noland Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Tarrasch Affidavit, #4 Exhibit State Court File, #5 Exhibit Cyprus Amax Consent, #6 Exhibit Cyprus Mines Consent, #7 Exhibit PTI Royston & PTI Union Consent, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Rankin, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stalnaker v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC
Represented By: Caroline M. Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Mary Anne Mellow
Represented By: Steven Thomas Walsh
Represented By: Mark A. Prost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Mines Corporation
Represented By: Mary Anne Mellow
Represented By: Steven Thomas Walsh
Represented By: Mark A. Prost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Royston, LLC
Represented By: Caroline M. Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velma Stalnaker
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Rados
Represented By: William Wylie Blair
Represented By: James G. Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?