Danzig et al v. LoanMe, Inc.
Plaintiff: HOWARD DANZIG and EMPLOYERS COMMITTED TO CONTROL HEALTH INSURANCE COSTS, INC.
Defendant: LOANME, INC. and LoanMe Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00389
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 41. Thu May 7 10:34:30 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #39 MOTION for Leave to file Plaintiff's Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (KEK) filed by Howard Danzig; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/7/2020. (KEK)
May 5, 2020 Filing 40 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF IT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (KEK)
May 5, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to file Plaintiff's Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (KEK)
May 5, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (KEK)
May 5, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to file response to Defendant's reply in support of it's motion to dismiss by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (KEK)
April 24, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Helfand, Scott)
April 24, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Helfand, Scott)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 34. Wed Apr 15 09:58:33 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #31 MOTION for Leave to File Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (ARL) filed by Howard Danzig; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/15/2020. (KEK)
April 14, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (ARL)
April 14, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (ARL)
April 14, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (ARL)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 30. Tue Apr 14 11:59:35 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #28 MOTION for Leave to file a rebuttal to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Purported motion to remand by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (KEK) filed by Howard Danzig; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/14/2020. (KEK)
April 10, 2020 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF'S REBUTTAL TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S PURPORTED MOTION TO REMAND #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KEK)
April 10, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to file a rebuttal to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Purported motion to remand by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (KEK)
April 6, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memorandum)(Helfand, Scott)
April 6, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Helfand, Scott)
April 2, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Leave to DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO REMAND filed by Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Helfand, Scott)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 22. Thu Apr 2 12:10:15 CDT 2020 (Luisetti, Andrea)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant by Plaintiffs Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion)(NEP) filed by Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. ; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/2/20. (ARL)
April 1, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Plaintiff Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (NEP)
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant by Plaintiffs Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion)(NEP)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 21. Tue Mar 31 21:07:22 CDT 2020 (Phillips, Nicole)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 20. Mon Mar 30 11:43:56 CDT 2020 (Luisetti, Andrea)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (KXS) filed by Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. ; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/30/20. (ARL)
March 26, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of #19 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (KXS)
March 26, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (KXS)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 18. Wed Mar 25 09:18:11 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer DEFENDANT LOANME, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Defendant LoanMe Inc. (Helfand, Scott) filed by LoanMe Inc.; The Court, while noting Plaintiff's opposition to the same, GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant has up to and including April 6, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/24/2020. (KEK)
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer DEFENDANT LOANME, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Helfand, Scott)
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron B. Chapin for Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Chapin, Aaron)
March 23, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott Helfand for Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Helfand, Scott)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 14. Fri Mar 20 15:25:56 CDT 2020 (Phillips, Nicole)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc., shall retain licensed legal counsel to represent it in this action no later than April 22, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc., will be dismissed from this action if licensed legal counsel does not file anentry of appearance on its behalf by April 22, 2020. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/20/2020. (NEP)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12, 13. Fri Mar 20 14:24:56 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE by Plaintiffs Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (KEK) filed by Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/20/2020. (KEK)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 and #8 ; ORDERED GRANTED. Attorneys Scott J. Helfand and Aaron B. Chaplin admitted to this case. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/20/2020. (KEK)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 by Plaintiffs Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (KEK)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE by Plaintiffs Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc. (KEK)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Plaintiff Howard Danzig. (KEK)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Aaron B. Chapin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7814777) by Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chapin, Aaron)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott J. Helfand. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7814702) by Defendant LoanMe Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Helfand, Scott)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant LoanMe Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hurtt, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Howard Danzig, Employers Committed To Control Health Insurance Costs, Inc..(BAK)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr for Defendant LoanMe, Inc.. (Hurtt, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant LoanMe, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hurtt, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant LoanMe, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Hurtt, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of Missouri, case number 20SL-CC00876, with receipt number AMOEDC-7807476, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by LoanMe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Hurtt, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danzig et al v. LoanMe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD DANZIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPLOYERS COMMITTED TO CONTROL HEALTH INSURANCE COSTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANME, INC.
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanMe Inc.
Represented By: Aaron B. Chapin
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?