Gibson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Janet Gibson
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00393
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Janet Gibson re #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Approval Order)(Chami, David)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Janet Gibson. (Chami, David)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Merkle, Zachary)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Merkle, Zachary)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/22/2020. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/8/2020. (AFC)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Merkle, Zachary)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Parent companies: Experian plc, Subsidiaries: Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC, Publicly held company: Experian plc,. (Merkle, Zachary)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary Stephen Merkle for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Merkle, Zachary)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Van Deven for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Van Deven, Nicholas)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary A. Hatch for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hatch, Mary)
March 16, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney David Chami. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Janet Gibson Process Server: Orange County Management (Chami, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Janet Gibson.. (Chami, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7811618, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Janet Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Chami, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Gibson
Represented By: David A. Chami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Stephen Merkle
Represented By: Nicholas P. Van Deven
Represented By: Mary A. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?