Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC v. Environmental Operations, Inc.
Plaintiff: Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC
Defendant: Environmental Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00400
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2615
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 Consent Decree Dismiss without Prejudice and Retention of Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement by Plaintiff Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Schwade, Michael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Golterman for Defendant Environmental Operations, Inc.. (Golterman, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted (No one in the office-no contact, Covid 19, numerous attempts) by Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC as to Environmental Operations, Inc.. (KKS)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (JAB)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
March 16, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Michael Schwade. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC Process Server: St. Louis City Sheriff (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Environmental Operations, Inc.)(Schwade, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM (Original Filing Form) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC. (Schwade, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2020 (BAK).
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM (Civil Cover Sheet) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC. (Schwade, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2020 (BAK).
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC. Parent companies: EB Holdings, LLC, EmployBridge, LLC, EmployBridge Holding Company, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: No,. (Schwade, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Environmental Operations, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7817135, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit Invoice Spreadsheet)(Schwade, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC v. Environmental Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remedy Intelligent Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?