Jacquin et al v. Nestle Purina PetCare Company
Plaintiff: Kristen Sparks, Kellen Jacquin and Gregory Waters
Defendant: Nestle Purina PetCare Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00467
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Hearing by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court (Shaw, Booker) Modified on 5/22/2020 (CSG). filed by Nestle Purina PetCare Company; ORDERED DENYING. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 05/26/20. (CMH)
May 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court (Shaw, Booker) Modified on 5/22/2020 (CSG).
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Electronic Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - D. Orlowsky Email, #3 Exhibit C - CaseNet Entry, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration)(Shaw, Booker)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Kellen Jacquin, Kristen Sparks, Gregory Waters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Orlowsky, Daniel)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs Kellen Jacquin, Kristen Sparks, Gregory Waters. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint; Proposed extension date thirty (30) days from entry of order on Plaintiffs' motion to remand filed by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Borders, Keri) filed by Nestle Purina PetCare Company; ORDERED GRANTING. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 04/07/2020. (CMH)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint ;Proposed extension date thirty (30) days from entry of order on Plaintiffs' motion to remand filed by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Borders, Keri)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Keri E. Borders. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7847765) by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing of Keri E. Borders)(Borders, Keri) filed by Nestle Purina PetCare Company, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dale J. Giali. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7847764) by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing of Dale J. Giali)(Giali, Dale) filed by Nestle Purina PetCare Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 04/03/20. (CMH)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Keri E. Borders. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7847765) by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Keri E. Borders)(Borders, Keri)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dale J. Giali. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7847764) by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Dale J. Giali)(Giali, Dale)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristen E. Sanocki for Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Sanocki, Kristen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda J. Hettinger for Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Hettinger, Amanda)
April 2, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Kellen Jacquin, Gregory Waters, Kristen Sparks.(BAK)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company. Parent companies: Nestle Holdings, Inc. and Nestle S.A., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Shaw, Booker)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nestle Purina PetCare Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Shaw, Booker)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 2022-CC00473, with receipt number AMOEDC-7845429, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Nestle Purina PetCare Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaw, Booker)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacquin et al v. Nestle Purina PetCare Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Purina PetCare Company
Represented By: Booker T. Shaw
Represented By: Keri E. Borders
Represented By: Dale Joseph Giali
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: Kristen E. Sanocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Sparks
Represented By: Daniel John Orlowsky
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellen Jacquin
Represented By: Daniel John Orlowsky
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Waters
Represented By: Daniel John Orlowsky
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?