Ambus et al v. Myeres et al
Plaintiff: Karen Ambus and Irene Smith
Defendant: Larry Myeres and The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00573
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 15. Wed Jun 10 09:24:18 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for remand #13 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for St. Louis City, Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties each bear their own costs incurred by reason of these removal and remand proceedings. [A COPY SENT TO ST. LOUIS CITY CIRCUIT COURT THIS DATE] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/9/2020. (KEK)
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 PLAINTIFFS' KAREN AMBUS AND IRENE J SMITH JOINT MOTION TO REMAND THIS CAUSE TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF SAINT LOUIS CITY by Plaintiff Karen Ambus and Irene J. Smith. (KEK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2020: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support) (KEK).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Thu May 21 11:49:35 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/30/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/7/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16S - St. Louis before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/21/2020. (KEK)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Tue May 19 16:48:50 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss #8 is GRANTED. The Cincinnati Insurance Company terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/19/2020. (KEK)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Bub, David)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cincinnati Insurance Company filed by Defendants Larry Myeres, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cincinnati Insurance Company by Defendants Larry Myeres, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bub, David)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM for Contribution against plaintiff Irene Smith by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres.(Bub, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine L Schwarze for Defendants The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres. (Schwarze, Catherine)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon B. Copeland for Defendants The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres. (Copeland, Brandon)
April 23, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, filed by Karen Ambus, Irene Smith.(JWD)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Bub, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bub, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 2022-CC00447, with receipt number AMOEDC-7881710, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bub, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambus et al v. Myeres et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Myeres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Catherine L Schwarze
Represented By: Brandon B. Copeland
Represented By: David P. Bub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ambus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?