Teahan v. The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Teahan
Defendant: The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. and John Does 1 and 2
Case Number: 4:2020cv00924
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In accordance with the parties' Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice [ECF No. #11 ], Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) (A)(ii). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/7/2020. (SMM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Puma, Elise)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thaddeus Teahan (Kraushaar, Corey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 17, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Puma, Elise)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Thaddeus Teahan.(MFG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Mike W. Bartolacci for Defendant The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Bartolacci, Mike)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by David M. Mangian for Defendant The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Mangian, David)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc..(Puma, Elise) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/17/2020) (MFG).
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc... (Puma, Elise) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/17/2020) (MFG).
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with receipt number AMOEDC-8022158, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Puma, Elise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teahan v. The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Teahan
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mike W. Bartolacci
Represented By: Elise Nicole Puma
Represented By: David M. Mangian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 and 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?