Morrow v. Ogunjobi et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Morrow
Defendant: Steven Ogunjobi and Jacob Stein
Case Number: 4:2020cv00928
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sharon Morrow Steven Ogunjobi waiver signed on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Anthony E. Rothert. (AAT)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM requesting summons to be issued for Jacob Stein by Plaintiff Sharon Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rothert, Anthony)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM requesting summons for steven ogoyjobi by Plaintiff Sharon Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rothert, Anthony)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Sharon Morrow Process Server: Tim Moore/Pro-Serve (Rothert, Anthony)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM issuance of summons to Steven Ogunjobi by Plaintiff Sharon Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rothert, Anthony)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Sharon Morrow Process Server: Tim Moore/Pro-Serve (Rothert, Anthony)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM requesting summons to be issued for Jacob Stein by Plaintiff Sharon Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rothert, Anthony)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessie M. Steffan for Plaintiff Sharon Morrow. (Steffan, Jessie)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER of Service issued defendantJacob Stein. sent to Jacob Stein on July 22, 2020 filed by Sharon Morrow. Waiver of Service due by 8/21/2020. (Rothert, Anthony)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER of Service issued defendantSteven Ogunjobi. sent to Steven Ogunjobi on 7/22/2020 filed by Sharon Morrow. Waiver of Service due by 8/21/2020. (Rothert, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Judge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (EAB)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Attorney notified that waivers are insufficient for service (date not filled in). (BAK)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Steven Ogunjobi, Jacob Stein with receipt number AMOEDC-8024430, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sharon Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service notice and request for waiver - stein, #4 Waiver of Service waiver - stein, #5 Waiver of Service notice and request for waiver - ogubjobi, #6 Waiver of Service waiver - ogunjobi)(Rothert, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Ogunjobi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ogunjobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Morrow
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?