Barbosa v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Francisco Barbosa
Defendant: General Motors LLC and General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00931
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Rule 16 Conference held on 9/1/2020. Conference held by phone. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (proceedings started: 1:20 pm) (proceedings ended: 1:40 pm)(Appearance for Plaintiff: James Avery)(Appearance for Defendant: Timothy Hasken) (ANP)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2: Motion to Join Parties due by 2/8/2021. Discovery Completion due by 8/30/2021. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2021. ADR Future Reference 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2021. Jury Trial set for 2/7/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Motion in Limine due by 1/24/2022.[SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/1/2020. (KEK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Francisco Barbosa. . (Avery, James)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Francisco Barbosa.. (Avery, James)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/21/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/1/2020 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/24/2020. (NEP)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/31/2020. (KEK)
July 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (MFG)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Francisco Barbosa.(MFG)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.(Hasken, Timothy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant General Motors LLC. Parent companies: General Motors Company, Subsidiaries: General Motors Holdings, LLC, General Motors LLC, Publicly held company: General Motors Company,. (Hasken, Timothy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit Court, case number 2011-CC00548, with receipt number AMOEDC-8025484, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Hasken, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbosa v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Hasken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Hasken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Barbosa
Represented By: James Garner Avery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?