Logan v. USA
Petitioner: De'Andre M. Logan
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00935
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Respondent USA filed by Respondent USA. (D'Agrosa, Paul)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Mailed to non-electronic party this date. Thu Jul 23 08:44:07 CDT 2020 (Cordray, Abby)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track 4: 2255 MOTION TO VACATE [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/23/2020. (AFC)
July 20, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Jul 20 11:00:44 CDT 2020 (admin,)
July 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (DJO)
July 20, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY by Petitioner De'Andre M. Logan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Paul Joseph D'Agrosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: De'Andre M. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?