Gunther v. St. Louis Psychiatric Rehabilitation Center et al
Plaintiff: Rex S. Gunther
Defendant: St. Louis Psychiatric Rehabilitation Center and Southeast Missouri Mental Health Center
Case Number: 4:2020cv00952
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Referring Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Fri Sep 4 09:07:58 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Rex Gunther re: appeals district judge. (KEK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO HAVE A CHANGE OF VOLITIONAL WILL ON MY PART AND CHANGE OF VENUE by Plaintiff Rex S. Gunther. (KEK)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Final Payment of Filing Fee: by Plaintiff Rex S. Gunther (CMH)
August 7, 2020 Receipt CAPE003785 in the amount of $50.00 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Rex Gunther (CCAM)
August 3, 2020 Receipt 4644088661 in the amount of $350.00 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Rex S Gunther (CCAM)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Rex S. Gunther. (CSG)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings (MRS)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Rex Gunther (MRS)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. w/ copy of prisoner civil rights form and motion ifp form Mon Jul 27 15:56:18 CDT 2020 (Schaefer, Michelle)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to either pay the filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff a copy of the Courts prisoner civil rights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the Court form within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon receipt of the amended complaint, the Court will review it pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 8/26/2020. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 8/26/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 7/27/20. (MRS)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 22, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Jul 22 14:00:44 CDT 2020 (admin,)
July 22, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
July 22, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (JWD)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Southeast Missouri Mental Health Center, St. Louis Psychiatric Rehabilitation Center, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Rex S. Gunther. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunther v. St. Louis Psychiatric Rehabilitation Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Psychiatric Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Missouri Mental Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex S. Gunther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?