Green v. Buckner
Petitioner: Shawn Green
Respondent: Michele Buckner
Case Number: 4:2020cv00969
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 FULL CONSENT has been received by Respondent Michele Buckner, Petitioner Shawn Green. (MCB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew Jacob Crane for Respondent Michele Buckner. (Crane, Andrew) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/2/2020) (MCB).
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 *FILED IN ERROR; SEE ENTRY #13 . ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew Clarke for Petitioner Shawn Green. (Clarke, Andrew) Modified on 9/2/2020 (MCB).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9, 10, 11. copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Fri Aug 28 14:44:31 CDT 2020 (Brown, Erica)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk sent to Petitioner Shawn Green re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/7/2020. (EAB)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 4. Show Cause Response due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/28/20. (EAB)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner Shawn Greens motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/28/20. (EAB)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Shawn Green. (EAB)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Tue Aug 4 12:20:04 CDT 2020 (Brown, Erica)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee, or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, within twenty- one (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to petitioner a copy of the Courts form motion to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit in support habeas cases. (Response to Court due by 8/25/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/4/20. (Attachments: #1 Attachment IFP Form)(EAB)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 27, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Jul 27 11:01:13 CDT 2020 (admin,)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick Joseph Logan for Respondent Michele Buckner. (Logan, Patrick)
July 27, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
July 27, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (JWD)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:20-cv-00572. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
July 27, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
July 23, 2020 RECEIPT number KCMO085394 in the amount of $5.00 issued to DOC for Shawn Green. (Melvin, Greg)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that: (1) Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and subject to modification by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri; and (2) this petition for a writ of habeas corpus and its attendant motions are transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on July 20, 2020 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Davies, Cindy)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shawn Green (Attachment: #1 Petition Exhibits)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michele Buckner
Represented By: Caroline M. Coulter
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Logan
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?