Clark et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Sacorey Clark and Laverne Henderson
Defendant: Ms. Rosalin Robinson, Mr. Unknown Perez, Ms. Unknown Hernandez, William Barr, Michael Carvajal, Mr. Jay Bagwell, John Doe #4, Mr. E. Williams, Ms. Unknown Huston, Mr. Unknown Patterson, Mr. Unknown Jones, John Doe #3, Mr. Unknown Dowding, Mr. Unknown Harkins, Mrs. Unknown Fitzpatrick, Ms. Unknown Hodges, John Doe #1, Mr. Unknown Serio, Ms. Unknown Santiago, John Doe #2, Mr. Unknown Allen and Mrs. Unknown Dugdale
Case Number: 4:2020cv01012
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. sent to non-electronic party this date Mon Aug 24 15:40:22 CDT 2020 (Berg, Melanie)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: [6} NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Sacorey Clark, Laverne Henderson (AAT) ; SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on August 24, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 08/24/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Sacorey Clark, Laverne Henderson (AAT)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. sent to non-electronic party this date along with court-provided forms Thu Aug 6 10:36:12 CDT 2020 (Berg, Melanie)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form and in compliance with the instructions set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, plaintiffs shall either pay the filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the Court-provided form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiffs a blank Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form and Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases form. The failure of plaintiffs to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. Response to Court due by 8/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on August 6, 2020. (MCB)
August 4, 2020 Judge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (Mailed to Clark and Henderson this date.) (MCB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 31, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jul 31 16:01:05 CDT 2020 (admin,)
July 31, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (DLB)
July 31, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiffs Sacorey Clark, Laverne Henderson. (DLB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH SIX (6) MONTH STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT(s) ATTACHED IN SUPPORT by Plaintiffs Sacorey Clark, Laverne Henderson. (DLB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 Document worded, "VERIFIED PRO SE CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT, UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a), 1343(a)(3), & (a)(4}, 1367, AND 42 U. S. C. 1985(3), 1986" construed as PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Unknown Allen, Jay Bagwell, William Barr, Michael Carvajal, John 1-4 Does, Unknown Dowding, Unknown Dugdale, Unknown Fitzpatrick, Unknown Harkins, Unknown Hernandez, Unknown Hodges, Unknown Huston, Unknown Jones, Unknown Patterson, Unknown Perez, Rosalin Robinson, Unknown Santiago, E. Williams Jury Demand,, filed by Laverne Henderson, Sacorey Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacorey Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverne Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Rosalin Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Unknown Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jay Bagwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Unknown Huston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Dowding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Harkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Unknown Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Unknown Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Serio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Unknown Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Unknown Dugdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?