Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC v. Sweetie Pie's Bakery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC
Defendant: Lydia Marie Allen and Sweetie Pie's Bakery, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01031
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel must file, no later than October 31, 2020, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss the action, or a proposed consent judgment. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 10/31/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/3/20. (KJS)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Lydia Marie Allen, Sweetie Pie's Bakery, LLC (Applewhite, Thomas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas Richard Applewhite for Defendants Lydia Marie Allen, Sweetie Pie's Bakery, LLC. (Applewhite, Thomas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC. All Defendants. (Voytas, Richard)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 7, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Richard A. Voytas, Jr.. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (MFG)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Filing of AO120: by Plaintiff Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC (Voytas, Richard)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Voytas, Richard)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC Process Server: Associated Research Services, LLC (Voytas, Richard)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr for Plaintiff Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC. (Voytas, Richard)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Lydia Marie Allen, Sweetie Pie's Bakery, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-8061608, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC v. Sweetie Pie's Bakery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Marie Allen
Represented By: Thomas Richard Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetie Pie's Bakery, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Richard Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweetie Pie's Upper Crust, LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?