Sally v. Panera Bread Company et al
Plaintiff: Randall Sally
Defendant: Panera Bread Company, St. Louis Bread Co. and Panera, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01068
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Referring Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Randall Sally. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Adam M. Goffstein for Plaintiff Randall Sally. (Goffstein, Adam)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER re #16 : Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Randall Sally; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/05/2020. (KCB)
October 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Randall Sally. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER Re: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 9/28/2020. (TMT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Preetha Chakrabarti. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8172229) by Defendants Panera Bread Company, Panera, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chakrabarti, Preetha)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendants Panera Bread Company, Panera, LLC. (Haar, Robert)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Randall Sally. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Randall Sally. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Additional Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Petition; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/25/2020. (TMT) Modified on 8/26/2020 (TMT).
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jozef James Kopchick for Defendants Panera Bread Company, Panera, LLC. (Kopchick, Jozef)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/20/2020. (KXS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Additional Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendants Panera Bread Company, Panera, LLC. (Haar, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Randall Sally.(BAK)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed with State Court of Removal to U.S. District Court from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 2022-CC01133, Jury Demand,, filed by Panera, LLC, Panera Bread Company.(Haar, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Plaintiff from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 2022-CC01133, Jury Demand,, filed by Panera, LLC, Panera Bread Company.(Haar, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Panera Bread Company. Parent companies: Panera Holdings Corp., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Haar, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Panera, LLC. Parent companies: Panera Bread Company, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Haar, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 2022-CC01133, with receipt number AMOEDC-8076093, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Panera, LLC, Panera Bread Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Docket and Pleadings, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sally v. Panera Bread Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panera Bread Company
Represented By: Robert T. Haar
Represented By: Patrick F. Hulla
Represented By: Preetha Chakrabarti
Represented By: Jozef James Kopchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Bread Co.
Represented By: Robert T. Haar
Represented By: Patrick F. Hulla
Represented By: Preetha Chakrabarti
Represented By: Jozef James Kopchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panera, LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Haar
Represented By: Patrick F. Hulla
Represented By: Preetha Chakrabarti
Represented By: Jozef James Kopchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Sally
Represented By: Daniel John Orlowsky
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?