Together Credit Union v. Allied Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Together Credit Union f/k/a Anheuser-Busch Employees' Credit Union, Together Credit Union and Anheuser-Busch Employees
Defendant: Allied Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01084
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint Defendant Allied's Reply Memorandum to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Allied's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Allied Solutions, LLC. (Cook, Gregory)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Allied Solutions, LLC. (Cook, Gregory) filed by Allied Solutions, LLC ; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING SEPTEMBER 30, 2020. ( Response to Court due by 9/30/2020.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on September 22, 2020. (MCB)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Allied Solutions, LLC. (Cook, Gregory)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Together Credit Union. (Larson, David)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Together Credit Union. (Larson, David) filed by Together Credit Union ; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING SEPTEMBER 14, 2020. ( Response to Court due by 9/14/2020.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on August 31, 2020. (MCB)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Together Credit Union. (Larson, David)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William R Griffin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8103018) by Plaintiff Together Credit Union. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Griffin, William) filed by Together Credit Union ; GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/27/2020. (AAT)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William R Griffin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8103018) by Plaintiff Together Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Griffin, William)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Allied Solutions, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Cook, Gregory)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by David Eric Larson for Plaintiff Together Credit Union. (Larson, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Together Credit Union. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Larson, David)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 8/27/2020. (EAB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Together Credit Union.(MFG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Allied Solutions, LLC. (Cook, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Allied Solutions, LLC. (Cook, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Allied Solutions, LLC Defendant's Submission of Pleadings from State Court Action Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Pleadings from State Court Action)(Cook, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Allied Solutions, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Cook, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2022-CC02929, with receipt number AMOEDC-8082444, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Allied Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Cook, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Together Credit Union v. Allied Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Together Credit Union f/k/a Anheuser-Busch Employees' Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Together Credit Union
Represented By: William R. Griffin
Represented By: David Eric Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anheuser-Busch Employees
Represented By: William R. Griffin
Represented By: David Eric Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?