Johnson Heating and Cooling et al v. Sheet Metal Worker's National Pension Fund
Plaintiff: Johnson Heating and Cooling
Defendant: The Trustees of the International Association of Sheet Metal, Air Rail, and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 36 Pension Plan and Sheet Metal Worker's National Pension Fund
Case Number: 4:2020cv01088
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend the Date to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #4 ) filed by Plaintiff is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 30, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are hereby stayed until November 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/16/2020. (KBL)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Johnson Heating and Cooling. (Harris, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Johnson Heating and Cooling to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/17/2020. (KCB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 2. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Johnson Heating and Cooling. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Harris, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8084663, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson Heating and Cooling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Waiver of Service Notice Waiver of Service-National Pension Fund, #7 Waiver of Service Notice Waiver of Service-Local 36)(Harris, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #8 Waiver of Service) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Heating and Cooling et al v. Sheet Metal Worker's National Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trustees of the International Association of Sheet Metal, Air Rail, and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 36 Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheet Metal Worker's National Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Heating and Cooling
Represented By: Michael F. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?