Gleason v. Sherman et al
Plaintiff: Seth Gleason
Defendant: Linda Sherman, Rodney E. Sherman and Rodlin Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Budget Towing
Case Number: 4:2020cv01089
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp: Rule 16 Conference held on 10/13/2020. Court reporter not present. Conference held by phone. Parties provide summary of case to the Court. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 2:31 pm) (proceedings ended: 2:35 pm)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Ethan Gee)(Appearance for Defendant: Jacob Kurtz) (TMT)
October 12, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Seth Gleason. . (Voytas, Richard)
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Ethan William Gee for Plaintiff Seth Gleason. (Gee, Ethan)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER Re: #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Seth Gleason; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/07/2020. (TMT)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss :Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Seth Gleason. (Voytas, Richard)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/13/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/13/2020 02:30 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/5/2020. (TMT)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant Linda Sherman ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Linda Sherman.(Kurtz, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant Rodney E. Sherman ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rodney E. Sherman.(Kurtz, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Rodlin Enterprises, Inc... (Kurtz, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant Rodlin Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Budget Towing ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rodlin Enterprises, Inc..(Kurtz, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss :Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Rodlin Enterprises, Inc., Linda Sherman, Rodney E. Sherman. (Kurtz, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss :Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Rodlin Enterprises, Inc., Linda Sherman, Rodney E. Sherman. (Kurtz, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Trevor Matthews Bond for Defendants Rodlin Enterprises, Inc., Linda Sherman, Rodney E. Sherman. (Bond, Trevor)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob Lee Kurtz for Defendants Rodlin Enterprises, Inc., Linda Sherman, Rodney E. Sherman. (Kurtz, Jacob)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Seth Gleason. Rodlin Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Seth Gleason. Linda Sherman served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Seth Gleason. Rodney E. Sherman served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Richard A. Voytas, Jr.. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. (BAK)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Seth Gleason Process Server: Mark Effinger (Voytas, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr for Plaintiff Seth Gleason. (Voytas, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8084078, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Seth Gleason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gleason v. Sherman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Sherman
Represented By: Jacob Lee Kurtz
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney E. Sherman
Represented By: Jacob Lee Kurtz
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodlin Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Budget Towing
Represented By: Jacob Lee Kurtz
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Gleason
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Ethan William Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?