Enterprise Holdings, Inc. v. Kramer
Plaintiff: Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: David Kramer
Case Number: 4:2020cv01091
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDING - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's uncontested Motion to Stay Proceedings [Doc. No. #15 ] is GRANTED. All pending deadlines in this case are STAYED pending the resolution of a pending criminal investigation by the U.S. Attorneys office for the Eastern District of Missouri, Case No. 4:20- wi-00016-HEA, involving the subject matter of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant David Kramer shall file a report with the Court regarding the status of the criminal case pending case by November 2, 2020, and every sixty days (60) days thereafter during the stay, and also within forty-eight (48) hours after the entry of a plea or return of a verdict in the criminal case. ( Status Report due by 11/2/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/30/2020. (JMP)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay proceedings in full filed by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Pautler, Richard)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay proceedings in full by Defendant David Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beal, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by James E. Beal for Defendant David Kramer. (Beal, James)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. David Kramer served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Pajda, Colin)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motions for temporary restraining order (Doc. No. #2 ) and for bond (Doc. No. #3 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/28/20. (KJS)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER Re: #10 Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Order Staying Case by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/25/2020. (AFC)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Order Staying Case by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Pautler, Richard)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT STAY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/21/2020. (JMP)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Stay Order)(Pautler, Richard)
August 19, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Colin Joseph Pajda. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG) Modified on 8/19/2020 (MFG).
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Process Server: by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc. (Pajda, Colin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Colin Joseph Pajda for Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Pajda, Colin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL Summons re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc. (Pautler, Richard) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct docketing event used (JWD).
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc. Request for Hearing on TRO (Pautler, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Bond by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Pautler, Richard) Modified on 8/19/2020 (MFG). [Clerk's note: document attached is a Proposed Bond Order]
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for TRO)(Pautler, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant David Kramer with receipt number AMOEDC-8085447, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Pautler, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enterprise Holdings, Inc. v. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Joseph Pajda
Represented By: Richard J. Pautler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kramer
Represented By: James E. Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?