Rana v. USA
Petitioner: Rehan A. Rana
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2020cv01092
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Respondent USA. (McMurtry, Dorothy) filed by USA ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/14/20. (KJS)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Respondent USA. (McMurtry, Dorothy)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: 2255 MOTION TO VACATE. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Show Cause Response due by 10/12/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/27/2020. (AFC)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Petitioner's Request for Postponement of Surrender Date Now Set for August 24, 2020, filed in connection with his Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, is DENIED. (ECF No. #1 ) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in Case Nos. 4:17CR00297 AGF and 4:18CR00770 AGF. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/21/2020. (CBL)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence Reply to Government's Opposition to Postpone Surrender Date filed by Petitioner Rehan A. Rana. (Markham, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Respondent USA. (McMurtry, Dorothy)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (DLB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 and Request for Postponement of Surrender Date Now Set for August 24, 2020 by Petitioner Rehan A. Rana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Tax Form 8879, #3 Declaration of Rehan Rana, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rana v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Dorothy L. McMurtry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rehan A. Rana
Represented By: John J Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?