Ward et al v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Ward and Morris Williams
Defendant: Stanley Payne, Sara Miller and Ted Eaton
Case Number: 4:2020cv01093
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of: time to file an amended complaint and pay the initial partial filing fee by Plaintiff Kevin Ward. (MCB)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Tue Sep 29 14:22:48 CDT 2020 (Thompson, Alicia)
September 24, 2020 Receipt 4644089591 in the amount of $4.00 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Kevin Ward #503532 (CCAM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Letter to the court from Plaintiff Kevin Ward Re: Preliminary Injunction. (EAB)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Tue Sep 15 16:20:48 CDT 2020 (Thompson, Alicia)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (Docket No. #11 ) is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/15/2020. (AAT)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Morris Williams. (MCB)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. #3 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.50 within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. #2 ) is DENIED at this time.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Morris Williamss motion to withdraw (Docket No. #9 ) is DENIED AS MOOT.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff a copy of the Courts prisoner civil rights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall filed an amended complaint on the Court form within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, in accordance with the instructions set forth above.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon receipt of plaintiffs amended complaint, the Court will review it pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. (cc: mailed the plaintiff a copy of the Courts prisoner civil rights complaint form.)( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 10/11/2020., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/11/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 09/11/2020. (AAT)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw by Plaintiff Morris Williams. (EAB)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to The Court from Plaintiff re: Case Status. (EAB)(Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff on 9/3/20).
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to the Court from Plaintiff re: Receipt of Magistrate Consent Form. (EAB)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Mon Aug 24 10:37:08 CDT 2020 (Battle, Kinica)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE plaintiff Morris Williams from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall open a new prisoner civil rights case for plaintiff Morris Williams, using the complaint filed in the instant matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Memorandum and Order in plaintiff Morris Williams's new case. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 08/24/2020. (KCB)
August 20, 2020 ***REMARK Judge Mensah COVID Standing Order mailed to the plaintiffs this day. (AAT)
August 20, 2020 Judge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (AAT)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
August 19, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Aug 19 11:01:44 CDT 2020 (admin,)
August 19, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (DJO)
August 19, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Kevin Ward. (DJO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiffs Kevin Ward, Morris Williams. NOTE: DOCUMENT NOT SIGNED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS WILLIAMS (DJO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiffs Kevin Ward, Morris Williams. NOTE: DOCUMENT NOT SIGNED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS WILLIAMS (DJO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Ted Eaton, Sara Miller, Stanley Payne Jury Demand,, filed by Kevin Ward, Morris Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kevin Ward, #2 Affidavit Morris Williams, #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Judge Assignment Label, #7 Envelope)(DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward et al v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?