Hall et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Twanda Hall, Khalia Hall and Y. H.
Defendant: United States of America and Jonathan Hopkins
Case Number: 4:2020cv01094
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Twanda Hall, Khalia Hall as to Jonathan Hopkins. - THE DEFENDANT NO LONGER WORKS AT THE ADDRESS LISTED ON THE SUMMONS - (AAT)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion for Appointment of Next Friend filed by Plaintiff Khalia Hall (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Khalia Hall is appointed as next friend of her minor child, Plaintiff Y.H.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/02/2020. (AAT)
August 21, 2020 Judge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (AAT)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Brent Sumner. (MFG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
August 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Summons by Plaintiffs Y. H., Khalia Hall, Twanda Hall. (Sumner, Brent)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to Y.H. ; relationship to minor:mother by Plaintiff Y. H.. (Sumner, Brent)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8086496, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Twanda Hall, Y. H., Khalia Hall. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons_Hopkins, #4 Summons Summons_USA)(Sumner, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twanda Hall
Represented By: Brent A. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalia Hall
Represented By: Brent A. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. H.
Represented By: Brent A. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?