Stills v. Salem, Missouri Police Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Troy Alan Stills
Defendant: Joseph Chase, Salem, Missouri Police Dept. and Robert Simpson
Case Number: 4:2020cv01099
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to the Court from Plaintiff (SMM) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/3/2020) (CLO).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Wed Aug 26 13:00:46 CDT 2020 (Marshall, Sean)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days after the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit a certified copy of his Dent County jail "trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent)" for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. (Response to Court due by 9/25/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/26/2020. (SMM)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
August 19, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Aug 19 16:01:39 CDT 2020 (admin,)
August 19, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (DJO)
August 19, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Troy Alan Stills. (DJO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Troy Alan Stills. (DJO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Joseph Chase, Salem, Missouri Police Dept., Robert Simpson Jury Demand,, filed by Troy Alan Stills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grievance Forms, #2 Exhibit Inmate Receipts, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Judge Assignment Label, #6 Envelope)(DJO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #7 Correspondence) (DJO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stills v. Salem, Missouri Police Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem, Missouri Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Alan Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?