Moore v. Saul
Plaintiff: Deborah J. Moore
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01100
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/28/2020. (CLO)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
August 31, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB)
August 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Traci L. Severs. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-8087624, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Deborah J. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Andrew Saul, #4 Summons Jeffrey Jensen, #5 Summons William Barr)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah J. Moore
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?