Heffner, Jr. et al v. Agee et al
Plaintiff: Robert E. Heffner, Jr. and Annette M. Frienza-Heffner
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co., Olivia C. Agee, Optum, Inc., Coghlan Law, LLC, The Rawlings Company, LLC and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv01105
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 25 Dismissal with Prejudice of all Claims Against Olivia C. Agee and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Gartner, Richard)
October 16, 2020 Filing 24 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Optum, Inc. (Znosko, Jennifer)
October 16, 2020 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer C. Znosko for Defendant Optum, Inc.. (Znosko, Jennifer)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND PARTIAL STAY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Plaintiffs' notices of dismissal, Plaintiffs' claims and causes of action against Defendants Rawlings and Coghlan only in each of the three cases are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each of these parties shall bear the party's own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that State Farm's motion for stay [ECF No. 19 in Case Number 4:20cv01090 PLC and ECF No. 20 in Case Number 4:20cv01105 PLC] is GRANTED so that proceedings in each of the three cases with respect to State Farm, including the deadline for State Farm to respond to the petition and State Farm's motion to consolidate, are STAYED for sixty (60) days after the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within sixty (60) days after the date of this Order, Plaintiffs and State Farm shall file material required to amicably and fully resolve Plaintiffs' claims and causes of action against State Farm in all three cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these three cases are passed for settlement for a period of thirty (30) days after the date of this Order with respect to Plaintiffs' claims against Optum only. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days after the date of this Order, Plaintiffs and Optum shall file material required to amicably and fully resolve Plaintiffs' claims and causes of action against Optum in all three cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 9/16/2020. (SMM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 Dismissal With Prejudice as to The Rawlings Company, LLC only NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Gartner, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Kuhn, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Gartner, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM re #17 Scheduling Order,, by Defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service on Optum, Inc., #2 Attachment Affidavit of Service on Coghlan Law)(Bokern, Terese)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Rawlings' supplemental NOR [ECF No. 5] is GRANTED so that its original NOR [ECF No. 1] is supplemented to include Coghlan's consent to Rawlings' removal of this case to this Court from the Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rawlings consent motion to strike its answer [ECF No. 13] is GRANTED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 9/4/2020. (CLO) Modified on 9/8/2020; documents mailed on 9/4. (JAB).
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Terese Drew Bokern for Defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC. (Bokern, Terese)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bokern, Terese)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/4/2020. (JAB)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Response by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response to Court due by 9/8/2020.) (SMM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kuhn, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Response by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Kuhn, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company with case number 4:20-cv-01090 (Attachments: #1 Motion to Consolidate Filed in Related Case)(Kuhn, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Kuhn, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (JWD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Charles County Circuit Court, filed by Robert E. Heffner, Jr., Annette M. Frienza-Heffner.(JWD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert F. Epperson, Jr for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (Epperson, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (Bennett, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. Sent To: Plaintiff (Kuhn, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kuhn, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Kuhn for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (Kuhn, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Charles County, case number 2011-CC00652, with receipt number AMOEDC-8088627, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet )(Kuhn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heffner, Jr. et al v. Agee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Kuhn
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Robert F. Epperson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia C. Agee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Znosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coghlan Law, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rawlings Company, LLC
Represented By: Terese Drew Bokern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Robert F. Epperson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Heffner, Jr.
Represented By: Richard A. Gartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette M. Frienza-Heffner
Represented By: Richard A. Gartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?