Perkins v. Piggee
Plaintiff: Judy L Perkins
Defendant: Luvenia Piggee
Case Number: 4:2020cv01109
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Mon Oct 5 11:20:34 CDT 2020 (Shirley, Kelley)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Judy L Perkins re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Form) (KJS)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Luvenia Piggee. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Luvenia Piggee. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
August 21, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Judy L Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BAK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Luvenia Piggee Sent To: Plaintiff (BAK)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St Louis County Circuit Court, case number 20SL-PN03026, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Luvenia Piggee. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Notice to Plaintiff, #5 State court file)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Piggee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luvenia Piggee
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy L Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?