New Madrid County v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: New Madrid County
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., J.M. Smith Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Novartis Pharamceuticals Corporation, McKesson Corporation, Indivior, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, 1-1000 DOES, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Watson Pharmaceticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, SPECGX LLC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, John Hunt, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 201, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Mylan N.V., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Apotex Corp., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 110 LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 132, LLC, AmeriSource Bergen Corporation, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Watson Pharma, Inc., John Kapoor, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01125
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC. (Soriano, Randy)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC and SpecGx LLC's Motion for a Temporary Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision (Doc. #11 ) is GRANTED and this case is STAYED pending the JPML's final decision on whether the action will be transferred. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/29/2020. (CLO)
September 24, 2020 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Apotex Corp.. (Berhe, Kaleb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY (to termed motion) re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff New Madrid County. (Edgar, John)
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Meyer, Julie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Soriano, Randy)
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff New Madrid County. (Edgar, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice: by Plaintiff New Madrid County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Edgar, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis by Plaintiff New Madrid County. (Edgar, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff New Madrid County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Polster's 2-16-18 Order Regarding Remands)(Edgar, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis by Plaintiff New Madrid County. (Edgar, John)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any objecting party shall file a response to Defendant's motion no later than Friday, September 4, 2020. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/28/20. (JAB)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Moving Defendants' motion is GRANTED. 2. Moving Defendants shall not be required to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until sixty (60) days after the later of: (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or (2) this Court's ruling on a motion to remand this action to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/26/2020. (CLO)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). To avoid any potential appearance of impropriety, Judge Stephen R. Clark disqualifies himself from this case. Therefore, the case is being randomly reassigned to a different Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable John A. Ross. (KXS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC... (Soriano, Randy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Soriano, Randy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Soriano, Randy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Soriano, Randy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Bay, Peter)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., AmeriSource Bergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Apotex Corp., Michael Babich, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Indivior, Inc., J.M. Smith Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis Pharamceuticals Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., SPECGX LLC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceticals, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf).(CLO)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Meyer, Julie)
August 24, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by New Madrid County.(BAK)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by New Madrid County.(BAK)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. Parent companies: Cardinal Health, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Meyer, Julie)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty Second Judicial Circuit - St. Louis City, case number 2022-CC00762, with receipt number AMOEDC-8094691, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet with attachments, #5 Attachment A, #6 Attachment B, #7 Attachment C, #8 Original Filing Form with attachment, #9 Attachment A)(Meyer, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Madrid County v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharamceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-1000 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC.
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Kaleb Nathaniel Berhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110 LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriSource Bergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Madrid County
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?