Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC v. Mattress Firm, Inc.
Plaintiff: Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC
Defendant: Mattress Firm, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01131
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #18 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice; SO ORDERED, The Rule 16 Conference scheduled for October 23, 2020 is hereby cancelled. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/15/20. (KJS)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice by Plaintiff Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC. (Tolles, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (JMP)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mattress Firm, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Steinhoff International Holdings, N.V.,. (Mason, Lawrence)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendant Mattress Firm, Inc., Plaintiff Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/11/2020. (CBL)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Parties' Consent Motion to Extend Deadline for Joint Scheduling Plan and Rule 16 Conference is GRANTED. ECF No. 13. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference will be scheduled for Friday, October 23, 2020 at 3:00, by teleconference, before the undersigned. Contact information will be provided to counsel by separate email.( Rule 16 Conference set for 10/23/2020 03:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/5/2020. (JMP)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Consent Motion to Extend Deadline for Joint Scheduling Plan and Rule 16 Conference by Fourteen Days by Plaintiff Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC. (Tolles, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Rule 16 Conference will remain as scheduled, on Wednesday, October 7, 2020 at 9:30 AM, by teleconference, before the undersigned. Contact information will be provided to counsel by separate email. (Rule 16 Conference set for 10/7/2020 09:30 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/18/2020. (AFC)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (KXS)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Lawrence David Mason for Defendant Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Mason, Lawrence)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/30/2020. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/30/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/7/2020 09:30 AM in Video Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/2/20. (EAB)
August 26, 2020 Judge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (MCB)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Tolles for Plaintiff Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC. (Tolles, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Receipt 4644089074 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of John Allen (CCAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
August 25, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Docket Entries by Defendant Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Allen, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Original Filing Form and Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, John)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Mattress Firm, Inc..(MFG)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC.(MFG)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 20SL-AC143030, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Original Answer, #3 Exhibit Petition, #4 Exhibit Notice of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Service)(Allen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC v. Mattress Firm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quapaw Whispering Pines, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Tolles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattress Firm, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Allen
Represented By: Lawrence David Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?