Wholesale Siding Depot, Inc v. Insul Board
Plaintiff: Wholesale Siding Depot, Inc
Defendant: iInsul Board and Insul-Board Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01162
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (MFG)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant's Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #9 is ORDERED GRANTED. Insul-Board Inc. answer is due 11/26/2020. No further extensions anticipated. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/28/2020. (CLO)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Defendant Insul-Board Inc.. (Jinkins, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Alan H. Norman for Defendant Insul-Board Inc.. (Norman, Alan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robyn H. Ast-Gmoser for Defendant Insul-Board Inc.. (Ast-Gmoser, Robyn)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Insul-Board Inc. Insul-Board Inc. waiver signed on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Jinkins, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew A. Braunel for Defendant Insul-Board Inc.. (Braunel, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by David B. Jinkins for Defendant Insul-Board Inc.. (Jinkins, David)
August 31, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB)
August 29, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Wholesale Siding Depot, Inc. Parent companies: Wholesale Siding Depot, Inc.,. (Heller, Annette)
August 28, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Wholesale Siding Depot, Inc. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (MFG)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-8106117, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Wholesale Siding Depot, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Notice of Lawsuit & Waiver, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Heller, Annette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wholesale Siding Depot, Inc v. Insul Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iInsul Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insul-Board Inc.
Represented By: Alan H. Norman
Represented By: Matthew A. Braunel
Represented By: Robyn H. Ast-Gmoser
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wholesale Siding Depot, Inc
Represented By: Annette P. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?