Moton et al v. Comenity Bank
Plaintiff: Ashley Hancock and Mary Moton
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Case Number: 4:2020cv01182
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, Unopposed by Defendant Comenity Bank. (Rummage, Ryan) filed by Comenity Bank ; ORDERED ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 23, 2020. (Comenity Bank answer due 11/23/2020.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/26/2020. (AAT)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, Unopposed by Defendant Comenity Bank. (Rummage, Ryan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Comenity Bank,Terminating Ashley Hancock (on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated) Amendment to #1 Complaint, Jury demand, , filed by Mary Moton. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Ashley Hancock, Mary Moton.(Greenwald, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Defendant Comenity Bank. (Rummage, Ryan) filed by Comenity Bank ; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING OCTOBER 13, 2020. Comenity Bank answer due 10/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on September 22, 2020. (MCB)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Defendant Comenity Bank. (Rummage, Ryan)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael L. Greenwald. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8118217) by Plaintiffs Ashley Hancock, Mary Moton. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwald, Michael) filed by Ashley Hancock, Mary Moton ; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on September 3, 2020. (MCB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael L. Greenwald. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8118217) by Plaintiffs Ashley Hancock, Mary Moton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwald, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mary Moton, Ashley Hancock. Comenity Bank served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (LaCroix, Anthony)
September 1, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Anthony LaCroix. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Ashley Hancock, Mary Moton Process Server: Brandywine Process Servers, Ltd. (LaCroix, Anthony)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Comenity Bank with receipt number AMOEDC-8113642, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mary Moton, Ashley Hancock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(LaCroix, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moton et al v. Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Hancock
Represented By: Anthony E. LaCroix
Represented By: Michael L. Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Moton
Represented By: Anthony E. LaCroix
Represented By: Michael L. Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?