Johnson v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Matthew L Johnson and Matthew L. Johnson
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services, Altisource Solutions, Inc. and PHH Mortgage Corporation doing business as PHH Mortgage Services
Case Number: 4:2020cv01212
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Matthew L. Johnson. . (Stoddard, Mitchell)
October 14, 2020 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc.. Parent companies: Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Subsidiaries: Altisource, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Frank, Alejandro)
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff Matthew L. Johnson. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/9/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/18/2020 02:30 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/8/2020. (KEK)
October 8, 2020 Filing 23 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. (EAB)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/16/2020. (EAB)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Altisource Solutions, Inc..(Frank, Alejandro)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Martin, Eric)
October 1, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/8/2020. (AAT)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Sommer, Hilary)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading is GRANTED. [Doc. 15.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc. shall file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Petition no later than October 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on September 21, 2020. (EMM)
September 20, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff Matthew L. Johnson. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
September 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Matthew L. Johnson. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc.. (Frank, Alejandro)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading is GRANTED. [Doc. 12.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation shall file its responsive pleading no later than September 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on September 18, 2020. (EMM)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Substitution and Withdrawal of Counsel is GRANTED. [Doc. 9.]Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on September 18, 2020. (EMM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Sommer, Hilary)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Alejandro Patricio Frank for Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc.. (Frank, Alejandro)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan for Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc.. (Cowan, Tracy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP ;substituted for:Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP by Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc.. (Sommer, Hilary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sommer, Hilary)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Altisource Solutions, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/21/2020. (MCB)
September 10, 2020 Judge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (MCB)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
September 9, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court City of St. Louis, filed by Matthew L. Johnson.(MFG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services. Parent companies: Ocwen Financial Corporation, Publicly held company: Ocwen Financial Corporation,. (Sommer, Hilary)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Hilary H. Sommer for Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services. (Sommer, Hilary)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Martin, Eric)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, case number 2022-CC00924, with receipt number AMOEDC-8129397, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Altisource Solutions, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Martin, Eric) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/9/2020) (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew L. Johnson
Represented By: Mitchell B. Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: Hilary H. Sommer
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Hilary H. Sommer
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Represented By: Alejandro Patricio Frank
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation doing business as PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: Hilary H. Sommer
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?