Bunton v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jamie M. Bunton
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01336
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jamie M. Bunton. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (CLO)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
October 28, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (SMM)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to the Local Rules and the Differentiated Case Management Program of the United States District Court of the Eastern District of Missouri, the Court ORDERS that the following provisions, which will only be modified upon a showing of exceptional circumstances, apply in this case: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/28/2020. (SMM)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: This matter is before the Court on #2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Upon review of the financial affidavit, the Court has determined that Plaintiff is unable to pay the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS #2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and ORDERS the Clerk to issue process or cause process to issue on the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/28/2020. (SMM)
September 25, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CBL)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Jamie M. Bunton. (BAK)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 4:20-cv-1336 by Plaintiff Jamie M. Bunton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Koch, Frank)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT 4:20-cv-1336 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Jamie M. Bunton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Koch, Frank)
September 24, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunton v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie M. Bunton
Represented By: Frank T. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?