Ali v. Lehure
Plaintiff: Jalil Salon Ali
Defendant: Tavares Lehure doing business as Capital Accounts, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01345
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 15,16. Thu Nov 12 10:23:38 CST 2020 (Phillips, Nicole)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/12/2020. (NEP)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED. An appropriate Judgment will accompany this Order. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/12/2020. (NEP)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 14. Tue Nov 10 13:10:10 CST 2020 (Luisetti, Andrea)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - This case is assigned to Track: 2. Motion to Join Parties due by 12/2/2020. Discovery Completion due by 5/14/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2021. Jury Trial set for 12/6/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/10/20. (ARL)
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings scheduled before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton: Rule 16 Conference NOT held on 11/10/2020. Defense counsel appeared by phone, however, Plaintiff failed to appear for the conference. CMO is being issued without a Rule 16 Conference. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (ARL)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob M. Glickfield for Defendant Tavares Lehure. (Glickfield, Jacob)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Tavares Lehure. by Defendant only. (Klein, Mayer)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jalil Salon Ali. Returned document(s): #7 Rule 16 Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (ANP)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Tavares Lehure. (Klein, Mayer)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Tavares Lehure. (Klein, Mayer)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Wed Oct 7 13:28:28 CDT 2020 (Petri, Alexis)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/30/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/10/2020 10:45 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/07/2020. (ANP)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint & Affirmative Defenses by Tavares Lehure.(Klein, Mayer)
September 25, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JWD)
September 25, 2020 ***REMARK: The case caption on the docket entries filed by plaintiff is styled "Ali v. Capital Accounts LLC," and attorney for defendant opened the case as such in CM/ECF. However, a review of the state court documents and state court docket sheet reflect that the correct case caption is "Ali v. Lehure." CM/ECF has been modified to reflect the name of the defendant as styled in state court. (JWD)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, filed by Jalil Salon Ali.(JWD)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Capital Accounts, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Klein, Mayer) Modified on 9/25/2020 to reflect that document is notice served upon plaintiff(JWD).
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mayer S. Klein for Defendant Capital Accounts, LLC. (Klein, Mayer)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Capital Accounts, LLC.. (Klein, Mayer)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Saint Louis City, case number 2022-SC00125, with receipt number AMOEDC-8171731, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Capital Accounts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Original Filing Form original filing form, #3 Exhibit A)(Klein, Mayer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Lehure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tavares Lehure doing business as Capital Accounts, LLC
Represented By: Mayer S. Klein
Represented By: Jacob M. Glickfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalil Salon Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?