Principal Financial Services, Inc. v. Principal Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Principal Financial Services, Inc.
Defendant: Principal Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01404
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey T. Norberg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8279387) by Plaintiff Principal Financial Services, Inc. (Norberg, Jeffrey) filed by Principal Financial Services, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/23/2020. (KEK)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey T. Norberg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8279387) by Plaintiff Principal Financial Services, Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons by Plaintiff Principal Financial Services, Inc.. (Suermann, John)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate for Defendant Principal Real Estate Holdings, LLC due by 10/12/2020. (KEK)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Principal Financial Services, Inc.. Parent companies: Principal Financial Services, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Principal Financial Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation, the common stock of which is publicly traded on the NASDAQ (symbol: PFG), Subsidiaries: Principal Financial Services, Inc. has no publicly traded subsidiaries, Publicly held company: None,. (Tranen, Daniel)
October 1, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Daniel Tranen. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (MFG)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 page 2, #2 AO 120 page 3) (MFG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Principal Financial Services, Inc. Process Server: Missouri Process Serving (MFG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Principal Financial Services, Inc.. Parent companies: No, Subsidiaries: No, Publicly held company: No,. (Tranen, Daniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint, Original File Form by Plaintiff Principal Financial Services, Inc.. (Tranen, Daniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Principal Financial Services, Inc.. (Tranen, Daniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Principal Real Estate Holdings, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-8181401, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Principal Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Attachment Notice of Process Server)(Tranen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal Financial Services, Inc. v. Principal Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Represented By: Jeffrey Norberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?