Pudic v. Department Stores National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Elvis Pudic and Capital One, NA
Defendant: Department Stores National Bank, Kohl's Inc. and Kohl
Case Number: 4:2020cv01456
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Department Stores National Bank's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. [Doc. 22.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his response to the motion to dismiss no later than December 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on November 30, 2020. (JMR)
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Department Stores National Bank's Motion to Dismiss #18 by Plaintiff Elvis Pudic. (Brody, Bryan)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL. Upon the filing of Plaintiffs Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Capital One, NA Only (Doc. 19) on November 16, 2020, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) (A)(i), the claims against Defendant Capital One, NA in this action are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 11/18/20. (EAB)
November 16, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elvis Pudic Kohl's Inc. waiver signed on 11/16/2020, answer due 1/15/2021. (Brody, Bryan)
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elvis Pudic as to Defendant Capital One, NA Only (Brody, Bryan)
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Department Stores National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hart, Suzanne)
November 10, 2020 ***REMARK - The notice to Defendant Kohl's regarding Disclosure of Organizational Interests was filed in error and withdrawn. (EAB)
November 10, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Capital One, NA, Kohl's Inc., Plaintiff Elvis Pudic to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/15/2020. (EAB)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Capitol One Bank's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Petition is GRANTED. [Doc. 16.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Capitol One Bank shall file its response to the Amended Petition no later than November 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on November 6, 2020. (EMM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) (Unopposed) by Defendant Capital One, NA. (Rummage, Ryan)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Suzanne Hart for Defendant Department Stores National Bank. (Hart, Suzanne)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Department Stores National Bank's Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. [Doc. 12.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Department Stores National Bank shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than November 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on October 20, 2020. (EMM)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Capital One, NA. Parent companies: Capital One Financial Corporation,. (Rummage, Ryan)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Department Stores National Bank. (Bonacorsi, Louis)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Petition is GRANTED. [Doc. 10.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. shall file its response to Plaintiff's Amended Petition no later than November 5, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on October 13, 2020. (EMM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) (Unopposed) by Defendant Capital One, NA. (Rummage, Ryan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Capital One, NA, Department Stores National Bank, Kohl's Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/23/2020. (AAT)
October 13, 2020 Judge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (AAT)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Consent to Removal by Defendant Capital One, NA. (Rummage, Ryan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF Appearance: by Defendant Capital One, NA (Rummage, Ryan) Modified on 10/13/2020 (AAT).
October 9, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Elvis Pudic.(BAK)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Elvis Pudic.(BAK)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Department Stores National Bank Sent To: Plaintiff (BAK)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Department Stores National Bank.. (BAK)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC04424, Jury Demand,, filed by Department Stores National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Form Corporate Disclosure, #7 Attachment Notice to Plaintiff of Removal)(Bonacorsi, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pudic v. Department Stores National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Pudic
Represented By: Bryan E. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital One, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Stores National Bank
Represented By: Louis F. Bonacorsi
Represented By: Suzanne Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?