Collier v. Vandergriff
Petitioner: Randy Collier
Respondent: David Vandergriff
Case Number: 4:2020cv01472
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5, 6, 7. Fri Oct 16 09:46:53 CDT 2020 (Tillman, Tiffani)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to appoint counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/16/2020. (TMT)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (2254 Habeas Corpus) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Respondent must show cause, in writing and within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, why the relief requested in the instant petition should not be granted. In accordance with Rule 5(b) of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases, Respondent's answer must address the merits of all grounds for relief alleged in the petition. In addition, it must state whether any ground in the petition is barred by a failure to exhaust state remedies, a procedural bar, non-retroactivity, or a statute of limitations. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/16/2020. (TMT)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner Randy Collier's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/16/2020. (TMT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
October 13, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Oct 13 12:01:17 CDT 2020 (admin,)
October 13, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
October 13, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Randy Collier. (JWD)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Randy Collier. (JWD)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Randy Collier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. Vandergriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Vandergriff
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?