Shaikh v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: ABDUL QADIR SHAIKH
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F. Wolf, Director Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 4:2020cv01511
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER re: ECF No. #18 , Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney AUSA Regan Hildebrand for AUSA Kristin Brudy-Everett, filed by Defendants Kenneth Cuccinelli, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, and Chad Wolf; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 15, 2020. (SMH)
December 15, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm AUSA Regan Hildebrand ;substituted for:AUSA Kristin Brudy-Everett filed by Defendants Kenneth Cuccinelli, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def. Ex. A, Initial Complaint, ECF No. 1, #2 Exhibit Def. Ex. B, Amended Complaint, ECF No. 6, #3 Exhibit Def. Ex. C, Motion to Transfer, ECF No. 7, #4 Exhibit Def. Ex. D, Transfer, ECF No. 9, #5 Exhibit Def. Ex. E, Notice of Appearance for Defendants, ECF No. 10, #6 Exhibit Def. Ex. F, Docket Shaikh v. USCIS, No. 20-cv-01511-RLW)(Hildebrand, Regan)
December 15, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm AUSA Regan Hildebrand ;substituted for:AUSA Kristin Brudy-Everett by Defendants Kenneth Cuccinelli, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf. (Hildebrand, Regan)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER re: ECF No. #13 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; ORDERED DENIED as moot, as the Motion was later refiled by all the Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's response time begins to run from the date of refiling. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 15, 2020. (SMH)
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def. Ex. A, I-130, Petition for Alien Relative, Dated April 25, 2016, #2 Exhibit Def. Ex. B, I-485, Application to Register Permanent Residence or Adjust Status, Dated 04.25.2016, #3 Exhibit Def. Ex. C, Notice of Intent to Deny, Dated June 10, 2020, #4 Exhibit Def. Ex. D, I-601, Application for Waiver of Grounds of Inadmissibilty, Dated July 10, 2020, #5 Exhibit Def. Ex. E, I-601 Decision, Dated August 25, 2020, #6 Exhibit Def. Ex. F, I-485 Decision, Dated August 25, 2020, #7 Exhibit Def. Ex. G, Notice To Appear, Dated September 8, 2020, #8 Exhibit Def. Ex. H, I-290B, Notice of Appeal or Motion, #9 Exhibit Def. Ex. I, I-290B Decision, Dated December 9, 2020)(Hildebrand, Regan)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Hildebrand, Regan)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by December 22, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint that complies with Rule lO(a), Fed. R. Civ. P. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/22/2020.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/14/2020. (TMT)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def. Ex. A, 04.25.2016, I-130, #2 Exhibit Def. Ex. B, 04.25.2016, I-485, #3 Exhibit Def. Ex. C, 06.10.2020, NOID, #4 Exhibit Def. Ex. D, 07.10.2020, I-601, #5 Exhibit Def. Ex. E, 08.25.2020, I-601 Decision, #6 Exhibit Def. Ex. F, 08.25.2020, I-485 Decision, #7 Exhibit Def. Ex. G, 09.08.2020, NTA, #8 Exhibit Def. Ex. H, 09.18.2020, I-290B, #9 Exhibit Def. Ex. I, Shaikh signed I-290B denial)(Hildebrand, Regan) Modified on 12/14/2020 (BRP).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER re: ECF No. #11 , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, and Chad F. Wolf; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint shall be filed by December 11, 2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on November 30, 2020. (SMH)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by Defendants KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Hildebrand, Regan)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Regan C. Hildebrand for Defendants KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Hildebrand, Regan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01399. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
October 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (BAK)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Missouri, pursuant to the Court Order entered 10/05/2020. Sent to Court via extraction. (zjf)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Combined Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue and Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint by December 4, 2020 unless another date is established by the transferee court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/5/2020. (lcabj1)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case and, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by ABDUL QADIR SHAIKH.(Hacking, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by October 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/2/2020. (lcabj2)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by September 4, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/30/2020. (lcabj2)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD WOLF (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS served on 6/1/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/4/2020; CHAD WOLF served on 6/4/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/5/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/4/2020.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7164175) filed by ABDUL QADIR SHAIKH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James)
May 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaikh v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ann Marie Jordan-Starks
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Represented By: Regan C. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Represented By: Regan C. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Represented By: Regan C. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Represented By: Regan C. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Represented By: Regan C. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABDUL QADIR SHAIKH
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?